Anthony et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Andrew Anthony and Hope Anthony
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv01525
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by United States of America with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting the United States' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint)Attorney Moha Yepuri added to party United States of America(pty:dft) (Yepuri, Moha)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States of America; U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of Texas, served on 6/27/2019; U.S. Attorney General, served on 7/5/2019. (Glassman, Jeffrey) Modified docket text on 7/15/2019 (zkc).
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 Summons issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (zkc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Andrew Anthony, Hope Anthony. (Glassman, Jeffrey)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Andrew Anthony, Hope Anthony. (Glassman, Jeffrey)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Andrew Anthony, Hope Anthony. (Glassman, Jeffrey)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Andrew Anthony, Hope Anthony. (Glassman, Jeffrey)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Hope Anthony, Andrew Anthony. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10073350) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Glassman, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Anthony
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey M Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Anthony
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey M Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Moha Yepuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?