Spencer v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC

Plaintiff: Amanda Spencer
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01536
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/6/2019 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/8/2019) (epm)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Specialized Loan Servicing Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Computershare Limited for Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Sparks, Jacob)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint filed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Sparks, Jacob)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC answer due 8/7/2019. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/25/2019) (rekc)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Jacob Sparks added to party Specialized Loan Servicing LLC(pty:dft) (Sparks, Jacob)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (epm)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amanda Spencer. (epm)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Specialized Loan Servicing LLC filed by Amanda Spencer. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number DS117131) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (epm)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Spencer
Represented By: Sharon K Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Jacob Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?