Nixon v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Tracy Shon Nixon
Defendant: Kimberlyn Rhynes, Mary Brown and Ken Paxton
Case Number: 3:2019cv01544
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:16. Tue Aug 13 16:26:08 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The court denies Plaintiff's new postjudgment motions (Docs. #12 , #13 , #14 ) for essentially the same reasons it denied the prior motions. Moreover, Plaintiff has not set forth any valid reason to justify recusal, and his displeasure with the court's rulings is not a legal basis for recusal. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 8/13/2019) (ndt)
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on appeal re #15 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tracy Shon Nixon. Received from Fifth Circuit for processing in this Office on 8/13/2019. (axm)
August 7, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:15. Wed Aug 7 16:49:43 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #8 Memorandum Opinion and Order to the Fifth Circuit by Tracy Shon Nixon. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Attachments: #1 Transcript Order Form) (ykp)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for New Trial filed by Tracy Shon Nixon. (epm)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Recusal filed by Tracy Shon Nixon. (epm)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION To Take Judicial Notice filed by Tracy Shon Nixon. (aaa)
July 17, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11. Wed Jul 17 14:23:15 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #9 Motion Nun Pro Tunc for Relief From Judgment to Correct Clerical Mistake; denying #10 Motion Nun Pro Tunc for Relief From Judgment to Correct Clerical Mistake. The court, however, alters its #8 memorandum opinion and order (Doc. 8) to the extent that it declines to rule on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, as it lacks jurisdiction to rule on the motion. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 7/17/2019) (rekc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION Nun Pro Tunc for Relief from Judgment to Correct Clericle Mistake filed by Tracy Shon Nixon (rekc)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION Nun Pro Tunc for Relief from Judgment to Correct Clericle Mistake filed by Tracy Shon Nixon (rekc)
July 9, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per #8 Memorandum Opinion and Order. (ndt)
July 9, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Tue Jul 9 14:54:52 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 9, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Tue Jul 9 14:51:28 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Memorandum Opinion and Order Denies #6 Motion for TRO filed by Tracy Shon Nixon and dismisses without prejudice this action for lack of subject matterjurisdiction. As Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #9 ) solely seeks a declaratory judgment from the court identical to the relief sought in the Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, the court directs the clerk to terminate this action. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 7/9/2019) (ndt)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Tracy Shon Nixon. (zkc)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Tracy Shon Nixon. (zkc)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 ***DISREGARD*** Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mla) Modified on 6/28/2019 (mla).
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Mary Brown, Ken Paxton, Kimberlyn Rhynes. (ajb)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Tracy Shon Nixon. (ajb)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Mary Brown, Ken Paxton, Kimberlyn Rhynes filed by Tracy Shon Nixon. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number DS117143) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ajb)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Case received over counter/electronically. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index. (ajb) Modified file date on 6/27/2019 (ajb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nixon v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberlyn Rhynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Paxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Shon Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?