Reynolds v The City of Commerce Tx
Plaintiff: Orvis Wain Reynolds
Defendant: City of Commerce Texas
Case Number: 3:2019cv01577
Filed: June 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to City of Commerce Texas. Waiver sent on 7/3/2019. (Hughey, William)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by City of Commerce Texas. (Jeffrey, James)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 Agreed STIPULATION as to Responsive Pleadings by City of Commerce Texas. (Jeffrey, James)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James T Jeffrey, Jr on behalf of City of Commerce Texas. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Jeffrey, James)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED WITHOUT LOCAL COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 83.10(a). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/19/2019) (ykp)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Counsel Admitted in Northern District Dallas Division filed by Orvis Wain Reynolds (Hughey, William)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Electronic Order: Unless exempted, Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in or maintain their principal office in this district. To date, one or more of the parties has failed to comply with Local Rule 83.10 or file a motion for leave to appear without local counsel. The parties have twenty days from this date to comply if they have not already done so. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2019) (ext)
June 29, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (svc)
June 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Orvis Wain Reynolds filed by Orvis Wain Reynolds. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10085991) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) City Order 17-00150, #2 Exhibit(s) City Order 17-00154, #3 Exhibit(s) City Order 17-00155, #4 Exhibit(s) City Order 17-00158, #5 Cover Sheet CV Cover) (Hughey, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v The City of Commerce Tx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orvis Wain Reynolds
Represented By: William T Hughey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Commerce Texas
Represented By: James T Jeffrey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?