Kroenke Sports & Entertainment LLC et al v. USAA Investment Management Company
Plaintiff: Kroenke Sports & Entertainment LLC and Outdoor Channel Holdings Inc
Garnishee: USAA Investment Management Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01614
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Referring Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment filed by USAA Investment Management Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge.Attorney Theodore C Schultz added to party USAA Investment Management Company(pty:gar) (Schultz, Theodore)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 USMS Process Receipt and Return: Writ of Garnishment to CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service Company on 7/17/2019. (epm)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw Appearance as Counsel. Kevin Evans and Nicholas Dowd are withdrawn as counsel for Plaintiffs. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 7/24/2019) (aaa)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Garnishment filed by Kroenke Sports & Entertainment LLC, Outdoor Channel Holdings Inc (Teicher, Shannon)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is hereby transferred to the docket of the Honorable Chief United States District Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn where related Civil Action No. 3:15-CV-666-M is pending. This action shall henceforth carry the suffix letter "M." All future pleadings and other papers shall be filed under Civil Action No. 3:19-CV-1614-M. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 7/23/2019) (aaa)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw Appearance as Counsel filed by Kroenke Sports & Entertainment LLC, Outdoor Channel Holdings Inc (Teicher, Shannon)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 Writ of Garnishment Issued as to USAA Investment Management Company. (ndt)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to issue Writ of Garnishment filed by Kroenke Sports & Entertainment LLC, Outdoor Channel Holdings Inc. (Teicher, Shannon)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kroenke Sports & Entertainment LLC, Outdoor Channel Holdings Inc. (Teicher, Shannon)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case filed by Kroenke Sports & Entertainment LLC, Outdoor Channel Holdings Inc (Teicher, Shannon)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment filed by Outdoor Channel Holdings Inc, Kroenke Sports & Entertainment LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10094705) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Final Judgment, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Bill Of Costs, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 - Affidavit Of Shannon Zmud Teicher, #4 Exhibit(s) 3-A Discovery Responses, #5 Cover Sheet) (Teicher, Shannon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kroenke Sports & Entertainment LLC et al v. USAA Investment Management Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kroenke Sports & Entertainment LLC
Represented By: Shannon Zmud Teicher
Represented By: Kevin Evans
Represented By: Paul C Watler
Represented By: Nicholas William Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Outdoor Channel Holdings Inc
Represented By: Shannon Zmud Teicher
Represented By: Kevin Evans
Represented By: Paul C Watler
Represented By: Nicholas William Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: USAA Investment Management Company
Represented By: Theodore C Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?