Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Grand HBL LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: Linda Henderson and Grand HBL LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01627
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Linda Henderson ; served on 7/29/2019. (King, Jamie)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Grand HBL LLC ; served on 7/26/2019. (King, Jamie)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jamie Renee King for David Michael Walsh IV on behalf of Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (King, Jamie)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel (Doc. No. #3 ). The Court DENIES the motion. Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. must retain and designate local counsel in accordance with Local Rule 83.10 within twenty (20) days from the date this Order is signed. Failure to comply will result in Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.'s complaint being stricken and the case being dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/16/2019) (ctf)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Linda Henderson. (rekc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Grand HBL LLC. (rekc) Modified text on 7/12/2019 (rekc).
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (King, Jamie)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (King, Jamie)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10100221) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Grand HBL LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand HBL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Represented By: David M Walsh, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?