Khan v. Johnson
Petitioner: Suhail Khan
Respondent: Jimmy Johnson
Case Number: 3:2019cv01699
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David L Horan
Referring Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Mon Sep 9 12:54:40 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Suhail Khan. New address: Collin County Detention Facility, 4300 Community Ave, McKinney, TX. (mla)
July 30, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2,4. Tue Jul 30 14:26:09 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 Mail returned as undeliverable. #1 Judge Lynn, #2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party received back from Suhail Khan as Attempted - Not Known - Not Here. Prisoner ID # was entered incorrectly, the document has been remailed (mla) Modified text on 7/30/2019 (epm).
July 19, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 4. Fri Jul 19 11:14:13 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND INSTRUCTIONS TO PARTIES IN A 28 U.S.C. SECTION 2241 HABEAS ACTION. The clerk has served this order and will regenerate notice of the petition and supporting documents to the designated Assistant US Attorney. Ann Cruce-Haag-DOJ for Jimmy Johnson added. Show Cause Response due by 9/17/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 7/19/2019) (zkc)
July 17, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Wed Jul 17 09:19:53 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Suhail Khan. (Filing fee $5.00; receipt number DS117617) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ndt)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (ndt)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Suhail Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jimmy Johnson
Represented By: Ann Cruce-Haag-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?