Rojas v. MegaMex Foods LLC/Don Miguel Foods
Plaintiff: Osvaldo Rojas
Defendant: MegaMex Foods, LLC and MegaMex Foods LLC/Don Miguel Foods
Case Number: 3:2019cv01712
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 Business Reply Card signed by USMS; re #9 Order, #10 Summons Issued, #3 Complaint. Signed on 8/22/2019. (zkc)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to MegaMex Foods LLC/Don Miguel Foods. (zkc)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 , #7 , #8 Motions for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of the Court is directed to issue summons for the defendant and deliver the summons and a copy of the complaint to the U.S. Marshal. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the referral of this action to the Magistrate Judge for screening and return the case to the docket of the District Judge for further action. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 8/21/2019) (zkc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Osvaldo Rojas. (mla)
August 10, 2019 Filing 7 Supplemental MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Supplement My debts by Credit Karma) (Rojas, Osvaldo) Docket event and text modified on 8/12/2019 (twd).
July 23, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Tue Jul 23 09:19:47 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Osvaldo Rojas must address the following deficiency: Plaintiff has not provided any other information to explain why he cannot pay the $400 filing fee. Doc. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 8/13/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 7/22/2019) (ndt)
July 18, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Thu Jul 18 16:15:09 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Osvaldo Rojas. (ndt)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Osvaldo Rojas. (ndt)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against MegaMex Foods, LLC filed by Osvaldo Rojas. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ndt)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (ndt)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rojas v. MegaMex Foods LLC/Don Miguel Foods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osvaldo Rojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MegaMex Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MegaMex Foods LLC/Don Miguel Foods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?