Cornelius v. Carrier Enterprise, LLC
Plaintiff: James Cornelius, Jr. and James Cornelius, Jr
Defendant: Carrier Enterprise, LLC and Carrier Enterprise LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01737
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for 8/31/2020 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 10/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2019. Motions due by 6/2/2020. Discovery due by 4/30/2020. Deadline for mediation is on or before 4/3/2020. Pretrial Order due by 8/17/2020. Pretrial Materials due by 8/17/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/16/2019) (rekc)
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Carrier Enterprise LLC. (Lis, Sarah)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time. The Court hereby allows the parties to hold the face-to-face Rule 26(f) conference on August 13, 2019, and submit their Joint Status Report on or before August 23, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/12/2019) (chmb)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Complete Joint Status Conference and File Joint Status Report filed by James Cornelius, Jr (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Brien, Kerry)
August 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kerry Vincent O'Brien for KAY GOGGIN on behalf of James Cornelius, Jr. (O'Brien, Kerry)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sarah J. Lis. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/30/2019) (chmb)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric A. Gordon. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/30/2019) (chmb)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10151866) filed by Carrier Enterprise LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Eric Andrew Gordon added to party Carrier Enterprise LLC(pty:dft) (Gordon, Eric)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10151757) filed by Carrier Enterprise LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Sarah Lis added to party Carrier Enterprise LLC(pty:dft) (Lis, Sarah)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 8/16/2019. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/26/2019) (epm)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Carrier Enterprise, LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Weitzel, Robert)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carrier Enterprise, LLC. (Weitzel, Robert)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 160th Judicial District Court of Dallas County, Texas, case number DC-19-08474 filed by Carrier Enterprise, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10128358) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Index, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4, #6 Exhibit(s) 5, #7 Exhibit(s) 6, #8 Exhibit(s) 7) (Weitzel, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornelius v. Carrier Enterprise, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cornelius, Jr.
Represented By: Kerry Vincent O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cornelius, Jr
Represented By: Kerry Vincent O'Brien
Represented By: Kay E Goggin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Enterprise, LLC
Represented By: Robert E Weitzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Enterprise LLC
Represented By: Robert E Weitzel
Represented By: Eric Andrew Gordon
Represented By: Sarah Lis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?