Stegall v. Latshaw Drilling Company LLC
Petitioner: John Stegall
Respondent: Latshaw Drilling Co L L C
Case Number: 3:2019cv01781
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 19 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (aaa)
July 26, 2019 Filing 18 Case electronically transferred in from District of Louisiana Western; Case Number 5:19-cv-00432. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER mooting #5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting #14 Joint Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/24/2019. (crt,Williams, L) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 7/26/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 16 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Corrected Signature Page filed by John Stegall regarding #14 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to ND Tex, #15 Response to Motion . (aty,Moulton, David) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 7/26/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Joint Motion to Transfer to ND Tex) filed by John Stegall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Moulton, David) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 7/26/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to ND Tex by John Stegall. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Moulton, David) Modified on 7/22/2019 to indicate corrected signature page filed as document #16 (Dauterive, C). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 7/26/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Response due by 7/18/2019. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 6/20/2019. (crt,Keifer, K) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 7/26/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Madalene A B Witterholt on behalf of Latshaw Drilling Co L L C (aty,Witterholt, Madalene) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 7/26/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Motions Transferred regarding #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with consent . Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Williams, L) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 7/26/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with consent by John Stegall. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Earles, Derrick) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 7/26/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of David I Moulton for John Stegall. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/14/2019. (crt,Keller, J) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 7/26/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for David I. Moulton to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3971926) by John Stegall. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Earles, Derrick) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 7/26/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Madalene A B Witterholt for Latshaw Drilling Co L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/29/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 7/26/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 7/26/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Latshaw Drilling Co L L C. (aty,Cancienne, Phyllis) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 7/26/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Latshaw Drilling Co L L C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(aty,Cancienne, Phyllis) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 7/26/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Madalene A.B. Witterholt to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3958034) by Latshaw Drilling Co L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing Texas State Bar, #3 Certificate of good standing Oklahoma State Bar)(Attorney Phyllis Guin Cancienne added to party Latshaw Drilling Co L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Cancienne, Phyllis) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 7/26/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/9/2019. (crt,Stephens, M) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 7/26/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Latshaw Drilling Co L L C (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 7/26/2019.]
April 5, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 7/26/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Latshaw Drilling Co L L C (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3918949) filed by John Stegall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Derrick Glenn Earles added to party John Stegall(pty:pla))(aty,Earles, Derrick) Modified on 4/8/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 7/26/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stegall v. Latshaw Drilling Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Latshaw Drilling Co L L C
Represented By: Phyllis Guin Cancienne
Represented By: Madalene A B Witterholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Stegall
Represented By: David I Moulton
Represented By: Derrick Glenn Earles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?