Malibu Media LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Malibu Media LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 3:2019cv01786
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/14/2019) (zkc)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/13/2019) (mla)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Malibu Media LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Beik, Paul)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 24(f) Conference filed by Malibu Media LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix - Exhibits A-C, #2 Proposed Order) (Beik, Paul) Modified docket text on 8/8/2019 (ajb).
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (ykp)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Malibu Media, LLC. (Beik, Paul) Modified on 7/26/2019 (ykp).
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Malibu Media, LLC. (Beik, Paul)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against John Doe filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10144440) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Cover Sheet) (Beik, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media LLC
Represented By: Paul Stephen Beik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?