Machock v. Medicredit Inc et al
Plaintiff: James Machock
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Texas Health Presbyterian Hospital Plano, Medicredit and Medicredit Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01789
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement filed by James Machock (Jaffer, Shawn)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Medicredit Inc. (Hays, Jeremy)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Medicredit Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hays, Jeremy)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Accordingly, the deadline for Medicredit Inc to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is 9/5/2019. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 8/21/2019) (chmb)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to Complaint filed by Medicredit Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Jeremy William Hays added to party Medicredit Inc(pty:dft) (Hays, Jeremy)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Texas Health Presbyterian Hospital Plano ; served on 7/31/2019. (Jaffer, Shawn)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Medicredit Inc, served on 8/1/2019. (Jaffer, Shawn)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Medicredit Inc, Texas Health Presbyterian Hospital Plano. (mla)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Payment for #1 Complaint filed by James Machock. ($400; Receipt number 0539-10149214). (Jaffer, Shawn)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by James Machock. (Jaffer, Shawn)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by James Machock. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0539-10149214) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Jaffer, Shawn) Modified filing fee information on 7/29/2019 (mla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Machock v. Medicredit Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Health Presbyterian Hospital Plano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medicredit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medicredit Inc
Represented By: Jeremy William Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Machock
Represented By: Shawn Jaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?