Johnson v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Plaintiff: Vicki Johnson
Defendant: DePuy Products Inc, DOES 1-10, inclusive, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc, DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc and Johnson & Johnson Inc
Special Master: Special Master
Case Number: 3:2019cv01815
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Pers Inj/Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 Case electronically transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 4:19-cv-00185. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 MDL Order granting unopposed motion to transfer. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on July 30, 2019. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, that this action is transferred to the Northern District of Texas and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable James Edgar Kinkeade for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings occurring there in this docket. (Jones, Robin) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/30/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/8/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 8/25/2019. Signed on 7/25/2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Stout, Courtney) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/30/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 Defendants' ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint on behalf of DePuy International Limited, DePuy Products, Inc., Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc..(Ball, Dan) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/30/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendants' Answer is due by 6/24/2019. Signed on 5/28/2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Stout, Courtney) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/30/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for extension of time To Respond To Amended Complaint filed by Dan H. Ball on behalf of DePuy International Limited, DePuy Products, Inc., Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/7/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Dan H. Ball added to party DePuy International Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Dan H. Ball added to party DePuy Products, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Dan H. Ball added to party Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Dan H. Ball added to party Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Dan H. Ball added to party Johnson & Johnson, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ball, Dan) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/30/2019.]
May 1, 2019 MDL ENTRY RE MDL NO. 2244 DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Pinnacle Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation NOTICE TO COUNSEL - The Clerk of the Panel has determined the listed action(s) is not appropriate for inclusion in this MDL. See Rule 7.1(b)(i). (MOW/4:19-cv-00185) Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 5/1/2019. (Jones, Robin) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/30/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Vicki Johnson. Waiver sent to Johnson & Johnson, Inc. on 4/17/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Cascio, Jennifer) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/30/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Vicki Johnson. Waiver sent to Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. on 4/17/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Cascio, Jennifer) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/30/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Vicki Johnson. Waiver sent to DePuy International Limited on 4/17/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Cascio, Jennifer) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/30/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jennifer M Cascio on behalf of Vicki Johnson.(Cascio, Jennifer) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/30/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause by 3/29/2019, why the case should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Signed on 3/18/2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Phillips, Caleb) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/30/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/30/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jennifer M Cascio on behalf of Vicki Johnson. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6213725. Service due by 6/10/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cascio, Jennifer) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Products Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Dan H Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Dan H Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy International Limited
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Dan H Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Dan H Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Dan H Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer M Cascio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Special Master
Represented By: James M Stanton-2244
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?