RAZ Imports Inc v. Regency International Business Corp
Plaintiff: Raz Imports Inc
Defendant: Regency International Business Corp. and Regency International Business Corp
Case Number: 3:2019cv01855
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Referring Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Regency International Business Corp. (Bexley, Tyler)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Regency International Business Corp with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Tyler J Bexley added to party Regency International Business Corp(pty:dft) (Bexley, Tyler)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10292813) filed by Regency International Business Corp (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney William Clayton Lawrence added to party Regency International Business Corp(pty:dft) (Lawrence, William)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10292765) filed by Regency International Business Corp (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Craig Whitney added to party Regency International Business Corp(pty:dft) (Whitney, Craig)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Special Order 3-335: Effective September 18, 2019, the cases listed on Exhibit A to this order are transferred to Judge Ada E. Brown's docket and shall henceforth be designated by the suffix letter "E." (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/18/2019) (cea)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Before the Court is the Parties' Agreed Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. No. 6), which the Court construes as an Agreed Motion. The Court GRANTS the motion. Answer or Response due from Regency International Business Corp on 9/30/2019. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/27/2019) (chmb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Agreed STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint [Dkt 1] by Regency International Business Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Marketos, Peter)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RAZ Imports Inc. (Pegues, Michael)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Regency International Business Corp. (mla)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (mla)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Regency International Business Corp filed by RAZ Imports Inc. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10164159) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Cover Sheet) (Pegues, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAZ Imports Inc v. Regency International Business Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regency International Business Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regency International Business Corp
Represented By: Peter D Marketos
Represented By: Tyler J Bexley
Represented By: Craig Whitney
Represented By: William Clayton Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raz Imports Inc
Represented By: Michael D Pegues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?