Nichols v. Baylor Scott & White Health
Plaintiff: Christy Nichols
Defendant: Baylor Scott & White Health and Baylor Research Institute
Case Number: 3:2019cv01883
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Christy Nichols re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hunnicutt, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Baylor Research Institute, Baylor Scott & White Health. (Voltmer, Alicia)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 Appendix in Support filed by Baylor Research Institute, Baylor Scott & White Health re #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Declaration of Jennifer Fox) (Voltmer, Alicia)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Baylor Research Institute, Baylor Scott & White Health with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)Attorney Alicia Sienne Voltmer added to party Baylor Research Institute(pty:dft) (Voltmer, Alicia)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Baylor Scott & White Health filed by Christy Nichols. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Summons(es) not requested at this time. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hunnicutt, James)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Baylor Scott & White Health answer due 9/13/2019. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 9/9/2019) (chmb)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by Baylor Scott & White Health (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Answer Deadline)Attorney Alicia Sienne Voltmer added to party Baylor Scott & White Health(pty:dft) (Voltmer, Alicia)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Baylor Scott & White Health. (zkc)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Christy Nichols. (Spencer, Jennifer)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Christy Nichols. (Spencer, Jennifer)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Baylor Scott & White Health filed by Christy Nichols. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10173818) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Spencer, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols v. Baylor Scott & White Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baylor Scott & White Health
Represented By: Peter Samir Wahby
Represented By: Alicia Sienne Voltmer
Represented By: Peter Karl Lacina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baylor Research Institute
Represented By: Alicia Sienne Voltmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Nichols
Represented By: Jennifer J Spencer
Represented By: Marshall Neal Bridges
Represented By: James E Hunnicutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?