Butterworth v. U.S. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Leah Butterworth
Defendant: U.S. Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv01884
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Referring Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by U.S. Social Security Administration. (Stoltz-DOJ, Brian)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING RULE 26(f) MEETING & SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Joint Report due by 9/13/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 8/21/2019) (aaa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Leah Butterworth on 08/13/2019. (Pitzner, Steven)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford for pretrial management. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/9/2019) (chmb)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (aaa)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Social Security Administration. (Stoltz-DOJ, Brian)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court at Law #2, Hunt County, Texas, case number CC1900255 filed by U.S. Social Security Administration. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Index of State Court Records, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Plaintiff's Original Petition, #4 Citation, #5 Return of Service, #6 Defendant's Plea to the Jurisdiction and Answer, #7 Receipt, #8 Response to Defendant's Plea to the Jurisdiction and Answer Including Plaintiff Butterworth's Request for Abatement as to these Proceedings Pending an Administrative Hearing, #9 Cover Sheet, #10 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Stoltz-DOJ, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butterworth v. U.S. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian Walters Stoltz-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Butterworth
Represented By: Steven R Pitzner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?