Anzaldua v. Titan Liner Inc
Plaintiff: Jennifer Anzaldua
Defendant: TitanLiner, Inc. and Titan Liner Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01933
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Referring Judge: A Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Per Special Order 3-335 issued on September 18, 2019, your case has been transferred to Judge Ada Brown. All parties are instructed that any existing scheduling orders and deadlines imposed by the previous judge remain in place unless the parties are otherwise notified by this Court. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/8/2019) (cea)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Special Order 3-335: Effective September 18, 2019, the cases listed on Exhibit A to this order are transferred to Judge Ada E. Brown's docket and shall henceforth be designated by the suffix letter "E." (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/18/2019) (cea)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY filed by Titan Liner Inc re: #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Lanagan, Paul)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jennifer Anzaldua. (Masterson, W)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: No later than 20 days after this order is filed, the plaintiff must comply with Rule 3.1(c) or 3.2(e) so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 8/23/2019) (epm)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE filed by Jennifer Anzaldua re: #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Masterson, W)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 Appendix in Support filed by Titan Liner Inc re #5 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s)) (Lanagan, Paul)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Titan Liner Inc re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Lanagan, Paul)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Titan Liner Inc. (Lanagan, Paul)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Titan Liner Inc. (Lanagan, Paul)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 134th District Court, Dallas County, case number DC-19-09702 filed by Titan Liner Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10188216) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Appendix in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit B-1, #5 Exhibit B-2, #6 Cover Sheet, #7 Cover Sheet Supplement, #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s)) (Lanagan, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anzaldua v. Titan Liner Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TitanLiner, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Michael Lanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titan Liner Inc
Represented By: Paul Michael Lanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Anzaldua
Represented By: W D Masterson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?