Cox v. Ally Bank
Plaintiff: Ariana Cox
Defendant: Ally Bank
Case Number: 3:2019cv01970
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:2615
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 14 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order (Agreed) by Ally Bank. (Schatz, Katrin)
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ariana Cox. (Masterson, W)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/2/2019) (rekc)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court sets FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference for 10/17/2019, at 10:00 AM, in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1632, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/2/2019) (chmb)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ally Bank. (Schatz, Katrin)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Ally Bank. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Schatz, Katrin)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This Order addresses the parties' Stipulation of Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Original Complaint [ECF No. 7]. The Court grants the Motion. The Court orders Defendant Ally Bank to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint [ECF No. 1] on or before 10/1/2019. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/9/2019) (ykp)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Ally Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schatz, Katrin)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Ally Bank; served on 8/20/2019. (zkc)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ally Bank. (axm)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ariana Cox. (Masterson, W)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons filed by Ariana Cox. (Masterson, W) Modified text and linkage on 8/16/2019 (axm).
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Ally Bank filed by Ariana Cox. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10197973) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Masterson, W)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Ally Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Bank
Represented By: Katrin U Schatz
Represented By: Mehronissa Modgil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariana Cox
Represented By: W D Masterson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?