MRC Energy Company v. US Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: MRC Energy Company
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Ken Cuccinelli and US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 3:2019cv02003
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Max Weintraub on behalf of Ken Cuccinelli, US Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Weintraub, J)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Huddleston, Brent)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying as unnecessary #3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brent T. Huddleston. Mr. Huddleston was recently admitted to the NDTX on 8/27/19. Clerk shall return admission fee to Applicant. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/30/2019) (chmb)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Ken Cuccinelli, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (mla)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 (Document Restricted) Sealed Attorney Contact Information (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by MRC Energy Company (Huddleston, Brent)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10206171) filed by MRC Energy Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (Huddleston, Brent)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MRC Energy Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Matador Resources Company for MRC Energy Company. (Huddleston, Brent)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by MRC Energy Company. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10206162) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) (Huddleston, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MRC Energy Company v. US Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: J Max Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: J Max Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MRC Energy Company
Represented By: Brent Turner Huddleston
Represented By: Amelia Potasznik-Kriv
Represented By: Brent T Huddleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?