Reed et al v. PLT Construction
Debtor: BFN Operations LLC
Appellant: Diane G Reed
Not Yet Classified: Barbara J Houser and Case Admin Sup
Appellee: PLT Construction
Case Number: 3:2019cv02016
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 Appellant's BRIEF by Diane G Reed. (Reding, Richard)
October 9, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Wed Oct 9 13:29:22 CDT 2019 (crt)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion Supplement the record on appeal. Pursuant to Fed. R. Banr. P. 8009(e)(2)(C), the Bankruptcy Clerk is directed to prepare a supplemental volume to the Record on Appeal containing Doc. Nos. 35 and 37 in the original Adversary Proceeding (Adv. No. 18-03186). The supplemental volume shall be numbered in accordance with LBR 8009.3. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/8/2019) (chmb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 Notice Transmitting Amended Mini Record Vol. 1 (to include documents 35 and 37) BK Record on Appeal re #6 Notice Transmitting BK Record on Appeal (Attachments: #1 Amended Mini Record Vol. 1) (Blanco - TXNB, Juan)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION Supplement the record on appeal filed by Diane G Reed with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Reding, Richard)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 Notice Transmitting COMPLETE BK Record on Appeal re #1 Notice Transmitting BK Appeal or Withdrawal of Reference (Attachments: #1 Mini Record Vol. 1, #2 Appellant Record Vol. 2, #3 Appellee Record Vol. 3) (Blanco - TXNB, Juan)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ethan J. Fleischer. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/12/2019) (chmb)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Ethan J. Fleischer (Filing fee $100; Receipt number DS0118753) filed by PLT Construction. (aaa)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #2 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard Reding. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/3/2019) (chmb)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10230344) filed by Diane G Reed (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (Reding, Richard)
August 23, 2019 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. (ajb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(d), the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal filed in #bankruptcy case number 18-03186 and the notice of appeal has now been docketed in the district court in case 3:19-cv-2016. (The filing fee has been paid in the Bankruptcy Court.) Pursuant to #Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009, before the record on appeal can be assembled and filed in the district court, designations of items to be included in the record on appeal and statements of issues must be filed in the bankruptcy case. If a sealed document is designated, the designating party must file a motion in the district court case for the document to be accepted under seal. See also #District Court Local Bankruptcy Rule 8012.1. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: #Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Notice of appeal and supporting documents) (Whitaker - TXNB, Sheniqua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed et al v. PLT Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: BFN Operations LLC
Represented By: Holland Neff O'Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Diane G Reed
Represented By: Kara E Casteel
Represented By: Richard J. Reding
Represented By: Richard James Reding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Barbara J Houser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Case Admin Sup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PLT Construction
Represented By: Eric M. Van Horn
Represented By: Ethan J. Fleischer
Represented By: Ethan Fleischer
Represented By: Eric Michael Van Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?