Shamoun v. Old Dominion Freight Line Inc
Plaintiff: Gregory Shamoun
Defendant: Old Dominion Freight Line Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv02034
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Commerce
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Old Dominion Freight Line Inc re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hubbard, Emileigh)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY filed by Old Dominion Freight Line Inc re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A) (Hubbard, Emileigh)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gregory Shamoun. (Norman, Brian)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Conference re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Gregory Shamoun. (Norman, Brian) Modified event text on 9/21/2019 (axm).
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Gregory Shamoun with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Norman, Brian)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE filed by Gregory Shamoun re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss (Norman, Brian)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: No later than 20 days after this order is filed, the plaintiff must comply with Rule 3.1(c) or 3.2(e) so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 8/30/2019) (axm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Court Request for Recusal: Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Senior Judge A. Joe Fish for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:19-cv-2034-G. (ctf)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Old Dominion Freight Line Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Henry, Vic)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Old Dominion Freight Line Inc. (Henry, Vic)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 298th Dallas County District Court, case number DC-19-10462 filed by Old Dominion Freight Line Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10217479) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 Index of State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit(s) 2A Plaintiff's Original Petition, #4 Exhibit(s) AB Citation to Old Dominion, #5 Exhibit(s) 2C Citation served on Old Dominion, #6 Cover Sheet, #7 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Henry, Vic)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shamoun v. Old Dominion Freight Line Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Shamoun
Represented By: C Gregory Shamoun
Represented By: LeDouglas G Johnson
Represented By: Brian Keith Norman
Represented By: J Blair Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Dominion Freight Line Inc
Represented By: Emileigh Stewart Hubbard
Represented By: Vic H Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?