Michaud v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Plaintiff: Elaine Michaud
Defendant: DePuy Products Inc, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc, DePuy Synthes Inc, DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc and Johnson & Johnson
Special Master: Special Master
Case Number: 3:2019cv02044
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Pers Inj/Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 Case electronically transferred in from District of Maine; Case Number 2:19-cv-00381. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 MDL CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER (slg) [Transferred from Maine on 8/27/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #5 MDL Certified Transfer Order. The Clerk's Office modified the entry to mark filed in error as the wrong menu option, MDL Certified Transfer Order was used. The document was re-filed using MDL Conditional Transfer Order, #6. (slg) [Transferred from Maine on 8/27/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (slg) [Transferred from Maine on 8/27/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 ***FILED IN ERROR*** MDL CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER (slg) Modified on 8/27/2019 to added filed in error notation. (slg). [Transferred from Maine on 8/27/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2064304.), filed by ELAINE MICHAUD.(FITZGERALD, KEVIN) [Transferred from Maine on 8/27/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER sent to MDL Panel. (bfa) [Transferred from Maine on 8/27/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DEPUY INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS INC, DEPUY PRODUCTS INC, DEPUY SYNTHES INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Depuy International, Ltd. summons, #2 Johnson & Johnson summons, #3 Depuy Products, Inc. summons, #4 Depuy Synthes, Inc. summons, #5 Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. summons)(bfa) [Transferred from Maine on 8/27/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) [Transferred from Maine on 8/27/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEPUY INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS INC, DEPUY PRODUCTS INC, DEPUY SYNTHES INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by ELAINE MICHAUD. (Service of Process Deadline 11/12/2019) Fee due by 8/16/2019.(bfa) [Transferred from Maine on 8/27/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michaud v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Products Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Synthes Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy International Limited
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Special Master
Represented By: James M Stanton-2244
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Michaud
Represented By: Kevin M Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?