McCall v. The State of Texas et al
Plaintiff: Robert Burns McCall
Defendant: Russ Henrichs, The State of Texas, Erleigh Norville and Joe Kendall
Case Number: 3:2019cv02063
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9,10. Tue Oct 15 15:06:48 CDT 2019 (crt)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT: The plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and 1915A(b)(1). This dismissal counts as a "strike" or "prior occasion" within the meaning 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/15/2019) (aaa)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ACCEPTING #6 , #8 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. By separate judgment, this action will be DISMISSED with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and 1915A(b)(1). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/15/2019) (aaa)
September 17, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Tue Sep 17 15:16:44 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Supplemental Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation re: the plaintiff's #3 Complaint. Plaintiff's new claims should also be summarily DISMISSED with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and 1915A(b)(1). The dismissal of this action will count as a "strike" or "prior occasion" within the meaning 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 9/17/2019) (mcrd)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Russ Henrichs, Joe Kendall, Erleigh Norville, The State of Texas filed by Robert Burns McCall. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ykp)
September 6, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Fri Sep 6 09:09:41 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation: Plaintiff's complaint should be summarily DISMISSED with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and 1915A(b)(1). The dismissal of the complaint will count as a "strike" or "prior occasion" within the meaning 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 9/5/2019) (mcrd)
September 3, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Certified copy mailed to Inmate Trust Fund Department of the Lamb County Jail Tue Sep 3 11:08:44 CDT 2019 (crt) Modified on 9/3/2019 (epm).
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order For Partial Filing Fee in amount of $0 with a balance of $350 remaining due in monthly installments. Clerk to mail this order to the attention of the Inmate Trust Fund Department at the facility where the inmate resides. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 9/3/2019) (epm)
August 29, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Thu Aug 29 16:05:38 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Robert Burns McCall. (sre)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Russ Henrichs, Joe Kendall, Erleigh Norville, The State of Texas filed by Robert Burns McCall. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (sre)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (sre)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCall v. The State of Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russ Henrichs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erleigh Norville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Burns McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?