NexPay, Inc. et al v. WEX Bank
Appellant: NexPay, Inc. and NexPay Inc
Appellee: WEX Bank and Benefit Administration Services LTD
Not Yet Classified: Case Admin Sup and Harlin D Hale
Case Number: 3:2019cv02122
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per #3 NOTICE of Dismissal of Appeal. (ykp)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF APPEAL AND CROSS-APPEAL by NexPay Inc. (Seckel, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Dismissal of Appeal filed by NexPay Inc (Seckel, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a), the court closes this action and consolidates it with Civil Action No. 3:19-CV-2122-L.* Henceforth, all pleadings filed in this action shall be filed under Civil Action 3:19-CV-2122-L, styled NexPay, Inc. v. WEX Bank and Benefit Administration Services, Ltd., and shall bear the legend "Consolidated with 3:19-CV-2124- L." The clerk of the court shall docket this order in this case, as well as Civil Action No. 3:19-CV-2122-L. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/10/2019) (aaa)
September 9, 2019 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. (axm)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(d), the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal filed in #bankruptcy case number 15-32587 and the notice of appeal has now been docketed in the district court in case 3:19-cv-2122. (The filing fee has been paid in the Bankruptcy Court.) Pursuant to #Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009, before the record on appeal can be assembled and filed in the district court, designations of items to be included in the record on appeal and statements of issues must be filed in the bankruptcy case. If a sealed document is designated, the designating party must file a motion in the district court case for the document to be accepted under seal. See also #District Court Local Bankruptcy Rule 8012.1. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: #Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Notice of appeal and supporting documents) (Whitaker - TXNB, Sheniqua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NexPay, Inc. et al v. WEX Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: NexPay, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey R Seckel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: NexPay Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey R Seckel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WEX Bank
Represented By: Keith J. Cunningham
Represented By: Eric A Soderlund
Represented By: Ryan F Kelley
Represented By: Lawrence M Edelman
Represented By: Joseph A Friedman
Represented By: Keith J Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Benefit Administration Services LTD
Represented By: David Grant Crooks
Represented By: Brian Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Case Admin Sup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Harlin D Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?