Branch v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Debra Branch
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and Does 1 through 100 inclusive
Case Number: 3:2019cv02130
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Pers Inj/Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 17 The Parties' Notice of Filing Submission Regarding Remand Or Transfer of Certain Cases by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, Debra Branch, C R Bard Incorporated. Documents requested by the parties from the MDL-2641 master case are attached. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Orders, #2 Discovery Orders, #3 Discovery and Privilege Orders, #4 Daubert Orders, #5 Motions in Limine, #6 Deposition Designation Orders, #7 Miscellaneous Orders, #8 Master and Short Form Pleadings) (twd)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, The parties are provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (twd)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 Case electronically transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:15-cv-01658. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
September 5, 2019 Remark: Case Remanded to the Northern District of Texas. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER (FINAL). ORDERED that the Action(s) on this Conditional Remand Order be Remanded to its/their Respective Transferor Court(s). See Order for Details. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re #10 , #11 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re #10 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/23/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
August 24, 2015 Filing 9 NOTICE that CV-15-1658-PHX-DGC (formerly Northern District of Texas 3:15-cv-1131) is now consolidated with and part of MDL No. 2641. Therefore, future pleadings pertaining to the above case will be filed in MDL-No. 2641. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
August 24, 2015 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:15-cv-01131 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
August 21, 2015 Filing 7 Conditional Transfer Order: The JPML has issued the attached order in MDL 2641, and that order has now been filed in the District of Arizona. (aaa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/24/2015.] [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
August 14, 2015 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/24/2015.] [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
August 14, 2015 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Matthews, Melissa) Modified filers on 8/14/2015 (skt). [Transferred from txnd on 8/24/2015.] [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
July 23, 2015 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to CR Bard Inc. Waiver sent on 6/17/2015. (Martin, Ben) [Transferred from txnd on 8/24/2015.] [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
July 23, 2015 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. Waiver sent on 6/17/2015. (Martin, Ben) [Transferred from txnd on 8/24/2015.] [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
April 14, 2015 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Lindsay. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (twd) [Transferred from txnd on 8/24/2015.] [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
April 14, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against C.R. Bard Inc filed by Debra Branch. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-6728462) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Martin, Ben) [Transferred from txnd on 8/24/2015.] [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branch v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Branch
Represented By: Ben C Martin
Represented By: Thomas W Arbon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?