Navalta v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Jessie Herrera Navalta
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv02148
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Referring Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STATUS REPORT ORDER: The Report shall be FILED no later than three weeks after issuance of this Order. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 11/6/2019) (aaa)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Unum Group for UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Davidoff, Bill)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Bill E Davidoff added to party UNUM Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (Davidoff, Bill)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Per Special Order 3-335 issued on September 18, 2019, your case has been transferred to Judge Ada Brown. All parties are instructed that any existing scheduling orders and deadlines imposed by the previous judge remain in place unless the parties are otherwise notified by this Court. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/8/2019) (cea)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Special Order 3-335: Effective September 18, 2019, the cases listed on Exhibit A to this order are transferred to Judge Ada E. Brown's docket and shall henceforth be designated by the suffix letter "E." (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/18/2019) (cea)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (sre)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jessie Herrera Navalta. (Guerrini, Bernard)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNUM Life Insurance Company of America filed by Jessie Herrera Navalta. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10255535) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Guerrini, Bernard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navalta v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Herrera Navalta
Represented By: Bernard A Guerrini
Represented By: John L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Bill E Davidoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?