BAPA Brooklyn 2004 LLC v. Pennymac Loan Services LLC
Plaintiff: BAPA Brooklyn 2004, LLC and BAPA Brooklyn 2004 LLC
Defendant: Pennymac Loan Services, LLC and Pennymac Loan Services LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02157
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Real Property: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEDIATION ORDER. The parties are to select or designate a mediator. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 7/3/2020. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 11/7/2019) (ndt) Modified text on 11/9/2019 (axm).
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this court's four-week docket beginning 12/7/2020 before Judge Sam A. Lindsay. Joinder of Parties due by 2/5/2002. Amended Pleadings due by 2/5/2020. Motions due by 7/17/2020. Discovery due by 7/3/2020. Pretrial Order due by 11/9/2020. Pretrial Materials due by 11/9/2020. Status Report due by 2/5/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Sam A. Lindsay. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 11/7/2019) (ndt)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Pennymac Loan Services LLC. (Hard-Wilson, Brenda)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND STATUS REPORT: Joint Status Report due by 11/6/2019. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/7/2019) (ndt)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL re: #5 Order, filed by Pennymac Loan Services LLC (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet A. Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement B. Supplemental Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit(s) C. Index, #4 Exhibit(s) C-1. Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit(s) C-2. Plaintiff's Original Petition, #6 Exhibit(s) C-3. Proposed TRO, #7 Exhibit(s) C-4. Temporary Restraining Order, #8 Exhibit(s) C-5. Trust Receipt, #9 Exhibit(s) C-6. Declaration of Jonathan Blount, #10 Exhibit(s) C-7. Motion to Ext TRO, #11 Exhibit(s) C-8. Prop Order on Mot to Extend Temp Order, #12 Exhibit(s) C-9. Verified Denial, Orig Answer and Affirm Defenses, #13 Exhibit(s) D. Dallas Cty. Appraisal District Valuation) (Hard-Wilson, Brenda)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Defendant is directed to file an amended notice of removal and related materials by September 16, 2019, in accordance with this order. Failure to do so will result in the sua sponte remand of this action to state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, as the court cannot determine or presume from documents filed in a prior action whether it has federal question or diversity jurisdiction over the current action. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/12/2019) (chmb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Pennymac Loan Services, LLC (Hard-Wilson, Brenda) Modified on 9/12/2019 (ndt).
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pennymac Loan Services, LLC. (Hard-Wilson, Brenda)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 193rd Judicial District Court of Dallas County, Texas, case number DC-19-13155 filed by Pennymac Loan Services, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10257850) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet A. Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement B. Supplemental Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit(s) C. Index, #4 Exhibit(s) C-1. Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit(s) C-2. Plaintiff's Original Petition, #6 Exhibit(s) C-3. Proposed TRO, #7 Exhibit(s) C-4. Temporary Restraining Order, #8 Exhibit(s) C-5. Trust Receipt, #9 Exhibit(s) C-6. Declaration of Jonathan Blount, #10 Exhibit(s) C-7. Motion to Ext TRO, #11 Exhibit(s) C-8. Proposed Order on Motion to Ext TRO, #12 Exhibit(s) C-9. Verified Denial, Orig Answer and Affirm Defenses, #13 Exhibit(s) D. Dallas Cty. Appraisal District Valuation) (Hard-Wilson, Brenda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAPA Brooklyn 2004 LLC v. Pennymac Loan Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAPA Brooklyn 2004, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAPA Brooklyn 2004 LLC
Represented By: Thomas C Barron
Represented By: Robert C Newark, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennymac Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Matthew K Hansen
Represented By: Brenda Amber Hard-Wilson
Represented By: Thomas G Yoxall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennymac Loan Services LLC
Represented By: Matthew K Hansen
Represented By: Brenda Amber Hard-Wilson
Represented By: Thomas G Yoxall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?