Brown v. Davis
Petitioner: Micah Brown
Respondent: Director, TDCJ Lorie Davis and Director, TDCJ-CID
Interested Party: Jeremy Schepers
Case Number: 3:2019cv02301
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David L Horan
Referring Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 18 Return of Service Executed as to Federal Public Defender - WDTX Capital Habeas Unit on 10/29/2019 re: #9 Order. (axm)
November 12, 2019 Filing 17 Return of Service Executed as to Office of Attorney General on 10/28/2019 re: #9 Order. (axm) Modified on 11/15/2019 (axm).
November 12, 2019 Filing 16 Return of Service Executed as to Office of the Attorney General, Criminal Appeals Division on 10/28/2019 re: #9 Order. (axm) Modified on 11/15/2019 (axm).
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Order denying Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No. #13 ) is hereby VACATED and withdrawn. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 11/12/2019) (ctf)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OBJECTION to a Magistrate Judge Order #9 MOTION APPOINTING COUNSEL AND SETTING DEADLINES (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 10/23/2019) (ykp) . (Gumkowski, Timothy)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ***VACATED AND WITHDRAWN PER #15 ORDER*** ORDER denying #11 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. On or before thirty days from the date of this Order, Petitioner shall pay to the Clerk of this Court the five-dollar filing fee in this case. Petitioner's failure to timely comply with this Order will result in the dismissal without prejudice of this action. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 11/12/2019) (aaa) Modified on 11/13/2019 (ctf).
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should deny Petitioner Micah Crofford Brown leave to proceed in forma pauperis and order that he pay the $5.00 filing fee within 21 days of any order accepting this recommendation (or within some reasonable time to be set by the Court), and, if he fails to do so, the Court should dismiss this action without prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil procedure 41(b) without further notice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/12/2019) (mcrd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Micah Brown (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Gumkowski, Timothy) Modified on 11/13/2019 to reinstate gavel per #15 Order (ctf).
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy Patrick Gumkowski on behalf of Micah Brown. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Gumkowski, Timothy)
October 24, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Thu Oct 24 16:13:07 CDT 2019 (crt)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION APPOINTING COUNSEL AND SETTING DEADLINES (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 10/23/2019) (ykp)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 (Document Restricted) Sealed Advisory from the Federal Public Defender for the Northern District of Texas (Sealed pursuant to order dated 10/15/2019) filed by Jeremy Schepers (Schepers-FPD, Jeremy)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SHOW CAUSE ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL: On or before seven days from the date of this Order, the FPD must file an advisory under seal. The clerk will transmit a copy of this Order and a copy of Petitioners motion for appointment of counsel to the Federal Public Defender for the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 10/15/2019) (aaa)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY filed by Micah Brown re: #1 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Ward, Michelle)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by Lorie Davis (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Miranda, Tina)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE filed by Lorie Davis re: #1 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Miranda, Tina)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tina J Miranda on behalf of Lorie Davis. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Miranda, Tina)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan. (ndt)
September 27, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Sam A. Lindsay. (cea)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Micah Brown (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Michelle Elizabeth Ward added to party Micah Brown(pty:pet) (Ward, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Micah Brown
Represented By: Michelle Elizabeth Ward
Represented By: Maureen Franco
Represented By: Federal Public Defender WDTX
Represented By: Benjamin B Wolff
Represented By: Timothy Patrick Gumkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, TDCJ Lorie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Represented By: Tina J Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jeremy Schepers
Represented By: Jeremy Don Schepers-FPD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?