Hernandez v. Bank of New York Mellon, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Magdalena Hernandez
Defendant: Citibank N.A., as Trustee and Bank of New York Mellon, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02414
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Real Property: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 Appendix in Support filed by Bank of New York Mellon, N.A. re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Harris, Shawnika)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bank of New York Mellon, N.A. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) (Harris, Shawnika)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawnika Harris on behalf of Bank of New York Mellon, N.A.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Harris, Shawnika)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/2/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 3/2/2020. Motions due by 10/15/2020. Jury Trial set for 4/5/2021 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 10/28/2019) (ndt)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of New York Mellon, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for Bank of New York Mellon, N.A.. (Cabrera, Marc)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of New York Mellon, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for Bank of New York Mellon, N.A.. (Cabrera, Marc)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 298th Judicial District Court, Dallas Co., TX, case number DC-19-07179 filed by Bank of New York Mellon, N.A.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10333075) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) C-1, #5 Exhibit(s) C-2, #6 Exhibit(s) C-3, #7 Exhibit(s) C-4, #8 Exhibit(s) C-5, #9 Exhibit(s) D, #10 Exhibit(s) E, #11 Exhibit(s) F) (Cabrera, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Bank of New York Mellon, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank N.A., as Trustee
Represented By: Joshua Gelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon, N.A.
Represented By: Robert T Mowrey
Represented By: Marc Daniel Cabrera
Represented By: Shawnika Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magdalena Hernandez
Represented By: Jason Andrew LeBoeuf
Represented By: Robert C Vilt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?