Advanced Physicians SC v. National Football League
Plaintiff: Advanced Physicians SC
Defendant: National Football League
Case Number: 3:2019cv02432
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 46 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #45 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Motion to Dismiss (Whitman, Molly)
December 3, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Motion to Dismiss filed by National Football League with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Whitman, Molly)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stacey R Eisenstein. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 11/19/2019) (ndt)
November 19, 2019 Filing 43 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Stacey R. Eisenstein (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10420391.) filed by National Football League (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Whitman, Molly) Modified docket text to include receipt number on 11/19/2019 (ali).
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge A. Joe Fish for all further proceedings. Judge Sam A. Lindsay no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/25/2019) (axm)
October 17, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Related Case re: #38 Case Transferred In - District Transfer,, filed by National Football League (Whitman, Molly)
October 17, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Molly E Whitman on behalf of National Football League. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Whitman, Molly)
October 16, 2019 Filing 38 Case electronically transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-02959. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
October 11, 2019 Filing 39 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre)
October 11, 2019 Filing 37 TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Texas the electronic record. (mc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 10/10/2019: Advanced's motion to remand #17 is denied, and the NFL's motion to transfer #13 is granted. The clerk shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas forthwith. Notices mailed. (psm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #33 is granted. The court will issue a ruling on the pending motions #10 #13 #17 via cm/ecf in which any further dates will be set. Notices mailed. (psm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Counsel with offices outside the Northern District of Illinois may appear by telephone for the status hearing on 7/24/19 by dialing 888-204-5984, and using access code 9146677. Notices mailed. (psm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16045970. (Nash, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY by Advanced Physicians, S.C. to response in opposition to motion #27 , MOTION by Plaintiff Advanced Physicians, S.C. to remand #17 (Aldous, Steven) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY by National Football League to MOTION by Defendant National Football League to transfer case #13 (Theis, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY by National Football League to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant National Football League #10 (Theis, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE by Advanced Physicians, S.C.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant National Football League to transfer case #13 (Aldous, Steven) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE by Advanced Physicians, S.C.in Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant National Football League #10 (Aldous, Steven) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM by National Football Leaguein Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Advanced Physicians, S.C. to remand #17 (Theis, John) Modified on 6/27/2019 (ek, ). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #22 #25 are granted. Notices mailed. (psm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15948500. (Tysse, James) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to modify the current briefing schedule #20 is granted. Responses to the motion to dismiss #10 , motion to transfer case #13 , and motion to remand #17 are due 6/26/19. Replies are due 7/10/19. No appearance on 6/6/19 or 6/11/19 is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Advanced Physicians, S.C. by Steven E Aldous (Aldous, Steven) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15891771. (Aldous, Steven) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATED NOTICE of Motion by John Kenneth Theis for presentment of motion by filer to set a briefing schedule #20 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 6/11/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Theis, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendant National Football League to set a briefing schedule STIPULATED (Theis, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by David Todd Mathews for presentment of motion to remand #17 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 6/6/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Mathews, David) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by Advanced Physicians, S.C. in support of motion to remand #17 (Mathews, David) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by Plaintiff Advanced Physicians, S.C. to remand (Mathews, David) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #8 #9 are granted. The briefing schedule on defendant's motions to dismiss #10 and transfer case #13 is as follows: plaintiff's response is due 6/4/19; defendant's reply 6/18/19. No appearance on the motion is necessary. A status hearing is set for 7/24/19 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed. notice (psm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by John Kenneth Theis for presentment of motion to transfer case #13 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 5/15/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Theis, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by National Football League in support of motion to transfer case #13 (Theis, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant National Football League to transfer case (Theis, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by John Kenneth Theis for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #10 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 5/15/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Theis, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM by National Football League in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #10 (Theis, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant National Football League (Theis, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15789094. (Crowley, James) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15788972. (Eisenstein, Stacey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (pk, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
May 2, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant National Football League by Allison M. Nichols (Nichols, Allison) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by National Football League (Theis, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant National Football League by John Kenneth Theis (Theis, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Theis, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2019-L-002857) filed by National Football League Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15783018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Dennis L. Curran, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Filing)(Theis, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Physicians SC v. National Football League
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Physicians SC
Represented By: Steven E Aldous
Represented By: David Todd Mathews
Represented By: Samira Z Kazaeli
Represented By: Jason C Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League
Represented By: Stacey Eisenstein
Represented By: Allison M Nichols
Represented By: Molly E Whitman
Represented By: James Cameron Crowley
Represented By: Daniel L Nash
Represented By: John Kenneth Theis
Represented By: James E Tysse
Represented By: Stacey R Eisenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?