Kemp v. Caliber Home Loans Inc
Plaintiff: Kenya Y Kemp
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc. and Caliber Home Loans Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv02506
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is DISMISSED without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to comply with the court's order of October 28, 2019 (docket entry #6 ). (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 11/21/2019) (aaa)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Caliber Home Loans Inc. (Sanders, Jason)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: No later than 20 days after this order is filed, the plaintiff must comply with Rule 3.1(c) or 3.2(e) so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 10/28/2019) (twd)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 11/19/2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 10/28/2019) (lag/chmb)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate LSF6 Service Operations, LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate LSF6 Mid-Servicer Holdings, LLC for Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Sanders, Jason)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Sanders, Jason)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 193rd District Court of Dallas County, case number DC-19-15582 filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10356821) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A Civil Cover Sheet and Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) B State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit(s) C Index of Docs, #4 Exhibit(s) C-1 Petition, #5 Exhibit(s) C-2 Proposed TRO, #6 Exhibit(s) C-3 TRO, #7 Exhibit(s) C-4 Caliber's Answer, #8 Exhibit(s) D COIP) (Sanders, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kemp v. Caliber Home Loans Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Jason L Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans Inc
Represented By: Jason L Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenya Y Kemp
Represented By: Robert C Newark, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?