Nolan v. Aerotek, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Elwood Nolan
Defendant: Aerotek Inc and Quantum Global Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02544
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 22 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
October 29, 2019 Filing 21 Case electronically transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-05275. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #9 #12 Defendants' Motions to Transfer Venue. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/29/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY (re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue ) filed byQuantum Global Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian J. McGinnis)(Szor, Lee) (Filed on 10/16/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/29/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF of Service for Complaint served on Aerotek & QuantumClean on 08/28/19 & 09/04/2019, filed by Elwood Nolan. (Vandall, Matthew) (Filed on 10/2/2019) Modified on 10/3/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/29/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 17 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue ) filed byElwood Nolan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Vandall, Matthew) (Filed on 9/30/2019) Modified on 10/1/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/29/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 16 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #9 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byElwood Nolan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2Proposed Order)(Vandall, Matthew) (Filed on 9/30/2019) Modified on 10/1/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/29/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Quantum Global Technologies, LLC.. (Torner, Tyreen) (Filed on 9/27/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/29/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: In light of the pending motion to dismiss, Defendant Quantum Global Technologies, LLC shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 7 days. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/4/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/29/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aerotek, Inc... (Stevens, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/27/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/29/2019.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue filed by Quantum Global Technologies, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 10/9/2019. Replies due by 10/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen DiRugeris, #2 Proposed Order)(Szor, Lee) (Filed on 9/25/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/29/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: In light of the filing of the motion to dismiss, Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 7 days. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/27/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/29/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 ERRATA re #9 MOTION to Dismiss by Aerotek, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Errata Replacing Exhibits to Defendant Aerotek's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Alternative Motion to Transfer Venue)(Stevens, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/19/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/29/2019.]
September 19, 2019 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Counsel is instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials KAW immediately after the case number Re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Aerotek, Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/29/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Aerotek, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Chambers before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 10/2/2019. Replies due by 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order Granting Dismissal, #3 Proposed Order Granting Transfer)(Stevens, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/18/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/29/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Rasha Abu-Zeyadeh. (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/29/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13694914.) filed by Elwood Nolan. (Abu-Zeyadeh, Rasha) (Filed on 9/11/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/29/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Aerotek, Inc., Quantum Global Technologies, LLC. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/29/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Elwood Nolan.. (Vandall, Matthew) (Filed on 8/26/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/29/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Vandall, Matthew) (Filed on 8/26/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/29/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 11 /19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/26/2019 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/29/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/6/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/29/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13641586.). Filed byElwood Nolan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Vandall, Matthew) (Filed on 8/23/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/29/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nolan v. Aerotek, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerotek Inc
Represented By: Cheryl Alesia Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quantum Global Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Tyreen Grissel Torner
Represented By: Lee Benjamin Szor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elwood Nolan
Represented By: Rasha Abu-Zeyadeh
Represented By: Matthew P. Vandall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?