Stockfood America Inc. v. DLS Healthworks LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stockfood America Inc. and Stockfood America Inc
Defendant: Dr. Lori L. Shemek and DLS Healthworks LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02608
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Report due by 12/30/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 12/9/2019) (aaa)
December 5, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DLS Healthworks LLC, Lori L. Shemek. (Please see Doc. #12 -1 for image.) (rekc)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint filed by DLS Healthworks LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Supplement Signed Cert of Interested Parties)Attorney Darrell W Smith added to party DLS Healthworks LLC(pty:dft) (Smith, Darrell)
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Lori L. Shemek; served on 11/13/2019. (Rothman, Joel) Modified text on 11/14/2019 (ykp).
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Lori L. Shemek. (ndt)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to issue Corrected Proposed Summonses filed by Stockfood America Inc. (Attachments: #1 proposed summons) (Rothman, Joel)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to DLS Healthworks LLC, Lori L. Shemek. (ykp)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (ykp)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Stockfood America Inc.. (Rothman, Joel)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Stockfood America Inc.. (Rothman, Joel)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Report of the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright re: #1 Complaint filed by Stockfood America Inc. (Rothman, Joel)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stockfood America Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate StockFood GmbH for Stockfood America Inc.. (Rothman, Joel)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND with Injunctive Relief Demanded against DLS Healthworks LLC, Lori L. Shemek filed by Stockfood America Inc. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10380905) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 - Demand Letters, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons) (Rothman, Joel) Modified text on 11/5/2019 (ykp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stockfood America Inc. v. DLS Healthworks LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Lori L. Shemek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DLS Healthworks LLC
Represented By: Darrell W Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stockfood America Inc.
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stockfood America Inc
Represented By: James E Key
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?