Lewis v. Halliburton Company
Plaintiff: Leo Lewis
Defendant: Halliburton Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv02707
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per 7 Order. (mla)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 12/3/2019) (Judge Jane J. Boyle)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Dismissal filed by Leo Lewis (Masterson, W)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Halliburton Company; served on 11/18/2019. (axm)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Halliburton Company. (mla)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Leo Lewis. (Masterson, W)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Halliburton Company filed by Leo Lewis. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10404285) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A) (Masterson, W)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Halliburton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Lewis
Represented By: W D Masterson, III
Represented By: D Elizabeth Masterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?