Gaines v. Dallas County
Plaintiff: Barry Gaines
Defendant: Dallas County
Case Number: 3:2019cv02715
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Referring Judge: David L Horan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Tue Nov 19 09:07:38 CST 2019 (crt)
November 19, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Tue Nov 19 09:03:40 CST 2019 (crt)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Judge's Questionnaire sent to Barry Gaines. Responses due by 12/19/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/18/2019) (ykp)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER REGARDING FILING FEE: Barry Gaines must address the following deficiency: The $400 fee has not been paid nor has a proper request to proceed in forma pauperis been submitted. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 12/19/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/18/2019) (ykp)
November 15, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Fri Nov 15 09:47:46 CST 2019 (crt)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Dallas County filed by Barry Gaines. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (cdt)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (cdt)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaines v. Dallas County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?