Coleman v. Petro Hunt LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alvester Coleman
Defendant: Petro Hunt LLC, CCI Up Stream, XTO Energy, BP America, Energy Future Holdings, Verado Energy and Rusk County Electric
Case Number: 3:2019cv02760
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Referring Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders' Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Plaintiff Alvester Coleman filed a motion for appointment of counsel. (ECF No. #6 .) A plaintiff in a civil action is not entitled to court-appointed counsel as a matter of right. The Court has determined that the interests of justice do not require appointment of counsel in this case. The motion is therefore DENIED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 1/17/2020) (ctf)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Alvester Coleman. (axm) (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/3/2019) (axm).
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 Public correspondence addressed to judge, received from Alvester Coleman re #6 Motion to Appoint Attorney. (axm)
November 26, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Tue Nov 26 17:06:09 CST 2019 (crt)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 11/26/2019) (rekc)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Petitioner's Court Appointed Attorney Ad Litem filed by Alvester Coleman. (axm)
November 20, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Wed Nov 20 09:34:31 CST 2019 (crt)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alvester Coleman. (cdt)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Alvester Coleman. (cdt)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against BP America, CCI Up Stream, Energy Future Holdings, Petro Hunt LLC, Rusk County Electric, Verado Energy, XTO Energy filed by Alvester Coleman. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (cdt)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (cdt)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Petro Hunt LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petro Hunt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCI Up Stream
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XTO Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy Future Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verado Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rusk County Electric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvester Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?