Foster v. Balis
Petitioner: Christopher John Foster
Respondent: NFN Balis
Case Number: 3:2019cv02797
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: David L Horan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5, 6. Fri Jan 3 13:35:25 CST 2020 (crt)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this action is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 1/3/2020) (ctf)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ACCEPTING #4 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 1/3/2020) (ctf)
December 4, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Wed Dec 4 16:04:02 CST 2019 (crt)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should dismiss the 28 U.S.C. 2241 petition for lack of jurisdiction. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 12/4/2019) (twd)
November 25, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Mon Nov 25 15:05:39 CST 2019 (crt)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against NFN Balis filed by Christopher John Foster. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (cdt)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (cdt)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. Balis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NFN Balis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher John Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?