Kolasani v. United States of America
Petitioner: Vishali Kolasani
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv02876
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: Brantley Starr
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party 26 USC 7609
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7609
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: Member case(s) 3:19-cv-2875, 3:19-cv-2876, 3:19-cv-2877 consolidated with lead case 3:19-cv-2874. All future pleadings and other papers shall henceforth be filed under civil action number 3:19-CV-2874-G. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 12/23/2019) (ykp)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The above numbered case is hereby transferred to the docket of the Honorable Judge A. Joe Fish, and shall henceforth carry the suffix letter "G." (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 12/19/2019) (ndt)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case filed by Vishali Kolasani (Bode, Teresa)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ndt)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Vishali Kolasani. (Bode, Teresa)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT/Petition to Quash Summons issued to Regions Bank against United States of America filed by Vishali Kolasani. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10455579) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B) (Bode, Teresa) Modified on 12/5/2019 (cdt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kolasani v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vishali Kolasani
Represented By: Teresa M Bode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?