Devabhaktuni v. Rutherford et al
Plaintiff: Manogna Devabhaktuni
Defendant: Ed Kinkeade, Rebecca Rutherford, Ada Brown, David C Godbey, Jane J Boyle, Irma Carrillo Ramirez, Karen Gren Scholer, Sam R Cummings, A Joe Fish, Renee Harris Toliver, David L Horan and Brantley Starr
Case Number: 3:2019cv02959
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINAL JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that this in forma pauperis action is DISMISSED without prejudice based on the prior sanction order in Manogna Devabhaktuni v. Honorable David C. Godbey, No. 3:19-CV- 2216-G (BT). The plaintiff may not re-file this action or any other civil action in this court without prepaying the requisite filing fees. The plaintiff is BARRED from filing any future lawsuits to the Northern District of Texas unless she first obtains leave of court from a district judge or magistrate judge through a proper motion for leave to file and pays the applicable filing fee. A proper motion for leave to file an action must be titled as a "Motion for Leave of Court to File Action" and must be accompanied by a copy of the plaintiff's proposed filing containing her original signature or that of her attorney and the applicable filing fee. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/3/2020) (Attachments: #1 3:19-CV-2216-G Sanction Order) (ykp)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ACCEPTING #4 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/3/2020) (ykp)
February 3, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5, 6. Mon Feb 3 15:45:59 CST 2020 (crt)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation re: the plaintiff's #3 Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Based on the relevant filings and applicable law, the application should be denied, the case should be summarily DISMISSED without prejudice unless the plaintiff timely pays the filing fee, and additional sanctions should be imposed on her for filing frivolous lawsuits. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 12/18/2019) (mcrd)
December 18, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Wed Dec 18 16:34:12 CST 2019 (crt)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.filed by Manogna Devabhaktuni. (oyh)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Jane J Boyle, Ada Brown, Sam R Cummings, Joe A Fish, David C Godbey, David L Horan, Ed Kinkeade, Irma Carrillo Ramirez, Rebecca Rutherford, Karen Gren Scholer, Brantley Starr, Renee Harris Toliver filed by Manogna Devabhaktuni. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (oyh)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index.) (oyh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Devabhaktuni v. Rutherford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Kinkeade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ada Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C Godbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane J Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Gren Scholer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam R Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Joe Fish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Harris Toliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L Horan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brantley Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manogna Devabhaktuni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?