McGlynn v. IHeartMedia Inc.
Plaintiff: David McGlynn
Defendant: IHeartMedia Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02968
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Before the Court is a Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Plaintiff's counsel (Doc. #6 ). The Court defers ruling on the motion because it does not comply with this Court's local rules regarding motions practice. The Court grants until 1/13/2020, to file an amended motion that complies with Rule 7.1. In addition, Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where an attorney appearing in a case does not reside or maintain his principal office in this district. Accordingly, within twenty-five days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case without prejudice and without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 1/8/2020) (ykp) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/9/2020) (aaa).
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by David McGlynn (Liebowitz, Richard)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to IHeartMedia Inc. (ndt)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (ndt)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by David McGlynn. (Liebowitz, Richard)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against IHeartMedia Inc. filed by David McGlynn. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10483333) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGlynn v. IHeartMedia Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David McGlynn
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IHeartMedia Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?