Brickman v. Fox Television Stations LLC
Plaintiff: Ashlie Brickman
Defendant: Fox Television Stations LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03064
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Filing 12 Report to Copyright Office of Notice of Settlement. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (ykp)
February 20, 2020 Civil Case Terminated per 11 Order. The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. (ykp)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The parties have settled this case. See Doc. 10, Notice of Settlement. In light of that development, the Court ORDERS the parties to submit a joint stipulation of dismissal or agreed final judgment no later than March 23, 2020. All other deadlines in this case are stayed. The Clerk of Court is directed to administratively close this case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 2/20/2020) (chmb)
February 19, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Fox Television Stations LLC (Latham, Robert)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendant's responsive pleading is now due on or before February 20, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 2/6/2020) (chmb)
February 5, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Fox Television Stations LLC (Latham, Robert)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendant's responsive pleading is now due on or before February 5, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/16/2020) (chmb)
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Fox Television Stations LLC Attorney Robert P Latham added to party Fox Television Stations LLC(pty:dft) (Latham, Robert)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Fox Television Stations LLC. (cdt)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (cdt)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Ashlie Brickman. (Liebowitz, Richard)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Fox Television Stations, LLC filed by Ashlie Brickman. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10506462) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brickman v. Fox Television Stations LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashlie Brickman
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Television Stations LLC
Represented By: Robert P Latham
Represented By: Elizabeth Walsh Pittman
Represented By: James Carlos McFall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?