DiscoverOrg Data LLC v. Aviture Inc
Plaintiff: DiscoverOrg Data LLC
Defendant: Aviture Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00104
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE filed by DiscoverOrg Data LLC re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Ullrich, Rachel)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #12 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend the Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 3/12/2020. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 3/4/2020) (chmb)
March 3, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by DiscoverOrg Data LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ullrich, Rachel)
February 13, 2020 Filing 11 Appendix in Support filed by Aviture Inc re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Kunhart, Ryan)
February 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Aviture Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)Attorney Ryan M Kunhart added to party Aviture Inc(pty:dft) (Kunhart, Ryan)
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aviture Inc. (Kunhart, Ryan)
February 11, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Aviture Inc, served on 1/23/2020. (Ullrich, Rachel)
January 22, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Aviture Inc. (ndt)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by DiscoverOrg Data LLC. (Ullrich, Rachel)
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (cdt)
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DiscoverOrg Data LLC. (Ullrich, Rachel)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff DiscoverOrg Data LLC. (Ullrich, Rachel) Modified on 1/16/2020 (cdt).
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against DiscoverOrg Data LLC filed by DiscoverOrg Data LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10547679) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ullrich, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiscoverOrg Data LLC v. Aviture Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aviture Inc
Represented By: Ryan M Kunhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DiscoverOrg Data LLC
Represented By: Rachel Ziolkowski Ullrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?