Wright v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
Plaintiff: Makala Kierra Wright
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00173
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: David L Horan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE AS TO VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Accordingly, the Court ORDERS Defendant to file, by 4/17/2020, a response to Wright's motion [Dkt. No. #16 ] or, alternatively, a stipulation of dismissal in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 3/18/2020) (ctf)
March 16, 2020 Filing 16 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Makala Kierra Wright (Wright, Makala)
March 16, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Mahaffey-DOJ, Clayton)
March 16, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #3 Complaint,, filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Clayton Ray Mahaffey-DOJ added to party Federal Bureau of Investigation(pty:dft) (Mahaffey-DOJ, Clayton)
March 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Evidence filed by Makala Kierra Wright (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Possible Spyware, #2 Exhibit(s) Defamation of character, #3 Exhibit(s) Defamation of character) (Wright, Makala)
March 9, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION Cease and Desist filed by Makala Kierra Wright (Wright, Makala)
March 9, 2020 Filing 11 ***PLEASE DISREGARD REFILED AS #12 *** Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) , Motion for Interpleader Disbursement (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) , MOTION to Intervene , MOTION to Join, MOTION for Judgment , MOTION for Judgment Based on ADR Settlement () filed by Makala Kierra Wright (Wright, Makala) Modified on 3/9/2020 (ndt).
March 5, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney; served on 2/13/2020. (hml) Modified on 3/5/2020 (axm).
March 5, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to the Federal Bureau of Investigation; served on 2/4/2020. (hml) Modified on 3/5/2020 (axm).
March 5, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to the U.S. Attorney General; served on 2/4/2020. (hml) Modified on 3/5/2020 (axm).
January 29, 2020 Filing 7 Business Reply Card signed by USMS; re #3 Complaint, #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, #6 Summons Issued, #1 Consent. Signed on 1/29/2020. (ykp)
January 29, 2020 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ykp)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, SPECIFYING FURTHER ACTION TO BE TAKEN BY THE CLERK, AND REQUIRING SERVICE BY THE MARSHAL granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/29/2020) (ykp)
January 23, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Makala Kierra Wright. (oyh)
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigation filed by Makala Kierra Wright. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (oyh)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (oyh)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Makala Kierra Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?