United HealthCare Services Inc et al v. Synergen Health LLC
Plaintiff: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company and United HealthCare Services Inc
Defendant: Synergen Health LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00301
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: Ada Brown
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The undersigned orders that all civil and criminal bench and jury trials, in-person court hearings, and sentencing proceedings scheduled to take place through May 1, 2020, are continued due to concerns about COVID-19 and consistent with the Northern District of Texas's Special Order Nos. 13-5 and 13-6, entered by Chief Judge Barbara Lynn on March 13, and March 18, 2020, respectively. In addition, if the attorneys have been ordered to conduct a face-to-face meeting for purposes of preparing a Rule 26(f) Joint Report, an in-person meeting is no longer required. These continuances do not modify any pending deadlines other than the trial or hearing dates mentioned above. Attorneys should file a motion with the Court to modify any other deadlines unless, as is the case in some cases transferred to this Court from other judges, the scheduling order allows the parties to reset deadlines by agreement without Court approval. Due to the Court's reduced ability to obtain an adequate spectrum of jurors, and due to the reduced availability of attorneys and court staff to be present in courtrooms because of the public health considerations associated with COVID-19, the period of the continuances associated with this Order and Special Order Nos. 13-5 and 13-6 are excluded by the Speedy Trial Act, 18 U.S.C. 3161(h) and 18 U.S.C. 3161 (h)(7)(A). The Court finds that the ends of justice served by ordering these continuances outweigh the best interests of the public and each defendants right to a speedy trial. In fact, the best interests of the public are served by these continuances. The Court encourages the parties to communicate with opposing counsel and litigants by video or telephone whenever possible. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 3/19/2020) (lrl)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Special Orders 13-5 and 13-6 re: Court Operations Under the Exigent Circumstances Created by the COVID-19 Pandemic (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 3/16/2020 and 3/18/2020)(lrl)
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Synergen Health LLC. Waiver sent on 2/12/2020. (Sinton, Adam)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ada Brown for all further proceedings. Judge Jane J. Boyle no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 2/19/2020) (svc)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case filed by United HealthCare Services Inc, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company (Sinton, Adam)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United HealthCare Services Inc, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. (Sinton, Adam)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Synergen Health LLC. (cdt)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by United HealthCare Services Inc, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400.00; receipt number 0539-10603813) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Cover Sheet) (Sinton, Adam) Modified filing fee on 2/7/2020 (cdt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United HealthCare Services Inc et al v. Synergen Health LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott Preston Kerew
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Represented By: Adam Joseph Sinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United HealthCare Services Inc
Represented By: Scott Preston Kerew
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Represented By: Adam Joseph Sinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synergen Health LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?