King v. Energy Transfer LP et al
Plaintiff: Barry King
Defendant: Steven R Anderson, William P Williams, Marshall S McCrea, III, LE GP LLC, Matthew S Ramsey, Michael K Grimm, Ray W Washburne, Ray C Davis, Richard D Brannon, Kelcy L Warren, John W McReynolds, K Rick Turner, Thomas E Long and Energy Transfer LP
Case Number: 3:2020cv00719
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Referring Judge: Brantley Starr
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders' Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: On 4/17/2020, the parties filed a joint stipulation requesting this Court to delay the deadline for all the defendants to file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint currently on file until the pending motion to consolidate [Doc. No. #9 ] is resolved. Upon consideration, the Court hereby STAYS the deadline for all the defendants to file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint until the pending motion to consolidate is resolved. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 4/20/2020) (ctf)
April 17, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION Regarding Defendants' Deadline to Answer by Steven R Anderson, Richard D Brannon, Ray C Davis, Energy Transfer LP, Michael K Grimm, LE GP LLC, Thomas E Long, Marshall S McCrea, III, John W McReynolds, Matthew S Ramsey, K Rick Turner, Kelcy L Warren, Ray W Washburne, William P Williams. (Ritchie, Robert)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The undersigned Senior United States District Judge hereby ORDERS that the above-styled and -numbered civil action be TRANSFERRED to the docket of the Honorable Brantley Starr, United States District Judge, for further case management. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 4/8/2020) (mla)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Vik Pawar. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 4/6/2020) (ykp)
April 6, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Appoint Lead and Liaison Counsel) filed by Barry King (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s) Declaration of Dean Gresham w exhibits, #2 Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order) (Gresham, R)
April 6, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Barry King (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s) Declaration of Dean Gresham with exhibits, #2 Proposed Order) (Gresham, R)
April 1, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Energy Transfer LP ; served on 3/27/2020; LE GP LLC ; served on 3/27/2020. (oyh)
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice without Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10737256) filed by Barry King (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pawar, Vik)
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Energy Transfer LP, LE GP LLC. (oyh)
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Barry King. (Attachments: #1 Summons to be Issued) (Gresham, R) Modified docket text on 3/25/2020 (oyh).
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case filed by Barry King (Gresham, R)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Barry King. (Gresham, R)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Barry King. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10725872) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Gresham, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Energy Transfer LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven R Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall S McCrea, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LE GP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew S Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael K Grimm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray W Washburne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray C Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelcy L Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W McReynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Rick Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy Transfer LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry King
Represented By: Vik Pawar
Represented By: R Dean Gresham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?