Clarke v. Pei Wei Asian Diner LLC
Plaintiff: Sharon Clarke
Defendant: Pei Wei Asian Diner LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00800
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Pei Wei Asian Diner LLC ; served on 4/10/2020. (Frisch, Andrew)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order, and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/18/2020) (axm)
May 15, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pei Wei Asian Diner LLC. (Brown, John)
May 15, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Pei Wei Asian Diner LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney John B Brown added to party Pei Wei Asian Diner LLC(pty:dft) (Brown, John)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Bradley Burch on April 7, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Frisch, Andrew)
April 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Ron Hardy on March 7, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Frisch, Andrew)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Pei Wei Asian Diner LLC. (oyh)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS (Cover Sheet) to #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Sharon Clarke. (Frisch, Andrew)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Sharon Clarke. (Frisch, Andrew)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Pei Wei Asian Diner LLC filed by Sharon Clarke. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10748707) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Frisch, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clarke v. Pei Wei Asian Diner LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Clarke
Represented By: Ashley M Landers
Represented By: Andrew Ross Frisch
Represented By: Andrew H Stuart
Represented By: C Ryan Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pei Wei Asian Diner LLC
Represented By: John B Brown
Represented By: Jeremy William Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?