CTC lst LLC v. Bank of New York Mellon
Plaintiff: CTC lst, LLC and CTC lst LLC
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Trustee and Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 3:2020cv01121
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Real Property: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Dismissal rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) filed by CTC lst LLC (Harter, Kenneth)
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of No Response re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bank of New York Mellon (Troiano, Daniel)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT PURSUANT TO FRCP 26(f) filed by Bank of New York Mellon. (Troiano, Daniel)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/12/2020) (aaa)
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bank of New York Mellon with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Appendix in Support, #2 Exhibits A-1 through A-6, #3 Exhibits B-1 through B5) (Troiano, Daniel)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth Stuart Harter on behalf of CTC lst LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Harter, Kenneth)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of New York Mellon Trustee identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for Bank of New York Mellon Trustee. (Troiano, Daniel)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 134th Judicial District Court, Dallas County, case number DC-20-03764 filed by Bank of New York Mellon Trustee. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10816416) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - CAD Detail, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Troiano, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CTC lst LLC v. Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Trustee
Represented By: Matt Delmore Manning
Represented By: Daniel P Troiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Daniel P Troiano
Represented By: Matt Delmore Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CTC lst, LLC
Represented By: Scott Andrew Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CTC lst LLC
Represented By: Scott Andrew Powell
Represented By: Kenneth Stuart Harter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?