Pixmarx IP LLC v. Snap Inc
Plaintiff: Pixmarx IP LLC
Defendant: Snap Inc. and Snap Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv01157
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend Time. Responses due by 7/17/2020. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 5/26/2020) (ndt)
May 22, 2020 Filing 9 Agreed MOTION to Extend Time Deadline For Defendant to Respond, Answer, or Otherwise Plead filed by Snap Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Doan, Jennifer)
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cole A Riddell on behalf of Snap Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Riddell, Cole)
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer H Doan on behalf of Snap Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Doan, Jennifer)
May 14, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Snap Inc ; served on 5/12/2020. (Nelson, Edward)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Snap Inc. (hml)
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (hml)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pixmarx IP LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Snap Inc. filed by Pixmarx IP LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10822432) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4, #6 Exhibit(s) 5, #7 Exhibit(s) 6, #8 Exhibit(s) 7, #9 Exhibit(s) 8) (Nelson, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pixmarx IP LLC v. Snap Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snap Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snap Inc
Represented By: Jennifer H Doan
Represented By: Cole A Riddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pixmarx IP LLC
Represented By: Christopher Granaghan
Represented By: Edward R Nelson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?