Carter v. Vujasinovic et al
Plaintiff: Samantha Carter
Defendant: Randall O Sorrels, David C Kent, Texas Bar Association, Christy Amuny, Robert D Crain, Fidel Rodriquez, Wendy-Adele Humphrey, Stephen J Naylor, Amie S Peace, Tonya Parker, August W Harris, III, Derek Cook, Jerry C Alexander, Sarah Clower Keathley, K Nicole Voyles, Robert E McKnight, Jr, Dimitri Dube, James C Woo, Rudolph K Metayer, Gregory W Sampson, Vuk Vujasinovic, Kevin Wiggins, Alison W Colvin, Sally Pretorius, G Thomas Vick, Jr, Alan E Sims, Bradley C Weber, Jeff Chandler, Estrella Escobar, Shari Goldsberry, Lisa S Richardson, Dinesh H Singhal, Victor Flores, Leslie W Dippel, Joe K Longley, Baili B Rhodes, Alistair B Dawson, VB Attorneys, Joe Horkey, Jr, Marc E Gravely, Laura Gibson, Jarrod T Foerster, Carmen M Roe, Angelica Hernandez, John Charles Ginn, Michael Dokupil, Curtis Pritchard, Christopher Oddo, Aldo D Lopez and Neil D Kelly
Case Number: 3:2020cv01199
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Filing 31 Case electronically transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-03746. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
May 12, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:32,33. Tue May 12 11:50:07 CDT 2020 (crt)
May 11, 2020 Filing 33 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (hml)
May 11, 2020 Filing 32 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
May 11, 2020 Filing 30 Case transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of Texas, pursuant to the Court Order entered 04/29/2020. Sent to Court via Extraction. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 5/11/2020. (lsj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re: #28 Order. See full Opinion and accompanying Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/29/20. (lccrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER transferring case to the Northern District of Texas and denying without prejudice #15 Judge Parker's Motion to Dismiss, #19 Vujasinovic's Motion to Dismiss, and #23 Texas Bar's Sealed Motion to Dismiss and finding as moot #16 Judge Parker's Motion to Stay. See full Order and accompanying Opinion for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/29/20. (lccrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY to opposition to motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by TONYA PARKER. (Contreras, Jason) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 26 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DIMITRI DUBE served on 3/18/2020, answer due 4/8/2020 (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 25 Summons Returned Unexecuted by SAMANTHA CARTER as to KEVIN WIGGINS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 24 Memorandum in opposition to re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #23 SEALED MOTION filed by TEXAS BAR ASSOCIATION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.), #19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by SAMANTHA CARTER. (Attachments: #1 envelope, #2 envelope)(ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 22 Memorandum in opposition to re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #10 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant the Honorable Judge Tonya Parker's Motion to Dismiss filed by SAMANTHA CARTER. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 23 SEALED MOTION filed by TEXAS BAR ASSOCIATION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' motions to dismiss the amended complaint by March 30, 2020, or Court may deem matter as conceded. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/9/20. (lccrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of #12 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and defendants' motions to dismiss the amended complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that #9 Texas Bar Association's Sealed Motion for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, #10 Judge Tonya Parker's Motion to Dismiss, and #7 Vujasinovic's "Special Answer," which the Court construed as a motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2), are DENIED AS MOOT. It is further ORDERED that #17 Texas Bar Association's Sealed Motion for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Under Seal is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that #20 Defendant Vujasinovic's Motion for CM/ECF Password is GRANTED. The Court expects all electronic filings by pro se litigants to comply with the Court's Local Rules. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/9/20. (lccrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for CM/ECF Password by VUK VUJASINOVIC (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 19 Amended MOTION to Dismiss by VUK VUJASINOVIC (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 17 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by TEXAS BAR ASSOCIATION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Defendant State Bar of Texas's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order on Defendant State Bar of Texas's Motion to Seal)(Kates, Amanda) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Summons (44) Issued for Amended Complaint as to JERRY C. ALEXANDER, CHRISTY AMUNY, JEFF CHANDLER, ALISON W. COLVIN, DEREK COOK, ROBERT D. CRAIN, ALISTAIR B. DAWSON, LESLIE W. DIPPEL, MICHAEL DOKUPIL, ESTRELLA ESCOBAR, VICTOR FLORES, JARROD T. FOERSTER, LAURA GIBSON, JOHN CHARLES GINN, SHARI GOLDSBERRY, MARC E. GRAVELY, AUGUST W. HARRIS, III, ANGELICA HERNANDEZ, JOE "RICE" HORKEY, JR, WENDY-ADELE HUMPHREY, SARAH CLOWER KEATHLEY, NEIL D. KELLY, DAVID C. KENT, JOE K. LONGLEY, ALDO D. LOPEZ, ROBERT E. MCKNIGHT, JR, RUDOLPH K. METAYER, STEPHEN J. NAYLOR, CHRISTOPHER ODDO, AMIE S. PEACE, SALLY PRETORIUS, CURTIS PRITCHARD, BAILI B. RHODES, LISA S. RICHARDSON, FIDEL RODRIQUEZ, CARMEN M. ROE, GREGORY W. SAMPSON, ALAN E. SIMS, DINESH H. SINGHAL, RANDALL O. SORRELS, G. THOMAS VICK, JR, K. NICOLE VOYLES, BRADLEY C. WEBER, JAMES C. WOO. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Subpoena "Leave to issue subpoena denied. This case remains at the motion to dismiss stage. No discovery order has been issued and no discovery may be pursued absent a discovery order or leave of the court." signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on not given. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Summons (1) Issued as to VB ATTORNEYS for Amended Complaint. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay Defendant Judge Parker's Opposed Motion to Stay Discovery by TONYA PARKER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Contreras, Jason) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by TONYA PARKER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Contreras, Jason) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Exhibit List by SAMANTHA CARTER (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B), which permits Plaintiff to amend her complaint as right within 21 days of service of a 12(b) motion, it is hereby ORDERED that #12 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is deemed the operative complaint. It is further ORDERED that all Defendants who have been properly served shall respond to the amended complaint by March 6, 2020. It is further ORDERED that 13 Plaintiff's Motion to Convene a Three-Judge Court is DENIED. The Amended Complaint does not identify any statute that requires a three-judge court, nor does Plaintiff's motion comply with LCvR 9.1. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/21/20. (lccrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Convene Three-Judge Court by SAMANTHA CARTER (ztd); (See docket entry no. #12 to view) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DIMITRI DUBE, TONYA PARKER, TEXAS BAR ASSOCIATION, VUK VUJASINOVIC, KEVIN WIGGINS, JOE K. LONGLEY, RANDALL O. SORRELS, G. THOMAS VICK, JR, LAURA GIBSON, JERRY C. ALEXANDER, CHRISTY AMUNY, JEFF CHANDLER, ALISON W. COLVIN, DEREK COOK, ROBERT D. CRAIN, ALISTAIR B. DAWSON, LESLIE W. DIPPEL, MICHAEL DOKUPIL, ESTRELLA ESCOBAR, VICTOR FLORES, JARROD T. FOERSTER, JOHN CHARLES GINN, SHARI GOLDSBERRY, MARC E. GRAVELY, AUGUST W. HARRIS, III, ANGELICA HERNANDEZ, JOE "RICE" HORKEY, JR, WENDY-ADELE HUMPHREY, SARAH CLOWER KEATHLEY, NEIL D. KELLY, DAVID C. KENT, ALDO D. LOPEZ, ROBERT E. MCKNIGHT, JR, RUDOLPH K. METAYER, STEPHEN J. NAYLOR, CHRISTOPHER ODDO, AMIE S. PEACE, SALLY PRETORIUS, CURTIS PRITCHARD, BAILI B. RHODES, LISA S. RICHARDSON, FIDEL RODRIQUEZ, CARMEN M. ROE, GREGORY W. SAMPSON, ALAN E. SIMS, DINESH H. SINGHAL, K. NICOLE VOYLES, BRADLEY C. WEBER, JAMES C. WOO, VB ATTORNEYS filed by SAMANTHA CARTER.(ztd); ("Leave to File Granted" signed 2/20/2020 by Judge Christopher R. Cooper) (Main Document 12 replaced on 2/20/2020) (ztd). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Dispositive Motions due by 3/10/2020. (lsj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' motions to dismiss or Court may deem the matter as conceded. Plaintiff is directed to file, by March 10, 2020, a combined opposition to #7 Vuk Vujasinovic's "Special Answer," which the Court construes as a motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2), #9 Texas Bar Association's Motion to Dismiss, and #10 Judge Tonya Parker's Motion to Dismiss. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/10/20. (lccrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant the Honorable Judge Tonya Parker's Motion to Dismiss by TONYA PARKER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Contreras, Jason) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 9 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by TEXAS BAR ASSOCIATION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Motion to Dismiss)(Kates, Amanda) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #6 Defendant Vujasinovic's Motion for CM/ECF Password. Defendant is directed to resubmit a motion that complies with LCvR 5.4(b)(2). Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/28/20. (lccrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by TONYA PARKER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Contreras, Jason) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Defendant Tonya Parker's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Judge Parker shall file her answer or responsive pleading by February 11, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/24/20. (lccrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by VUK VUJASINOVIC.(ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for CM/ECF Password by VUK VUJASINOVIC (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall file their answer or responsive pleading by February 3, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/17/20. (lccrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/3/2020. (nbn) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file a corrected complaint by February 18, 2020, which shall include her residential address and the residential or business address of each defendant, as required by LCvR 11.1. Plaintiff is advised that failure to provide to required information may result in dismissal of the action. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/17/20. (lccrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Corrected Amended Pleadings due by 2/18/2020. (nbn) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by TEXAS BAR ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kates, Amanda) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TONYA PARKER served on 1/7/2020, answer due 1/28/2020 (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TEXAS BAR ASSOCIATION served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/20/2020 (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. VUK VUJASINOVIC served on 12/27/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DIMITRI DUBE, TONYA PARKER, TEXAS BAR ASSOCIATION, VUK VUJASINOVIC, KEVIN WIGGINS ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616101821) with Jury Demand filed by SAMANTHA CARTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Summons (5) Issued as to DIMITRI DUBE, TONYA PARKER, TEXAS BAR ASSOCIATION, VUK VUJASINOVIC, KEVIN WIGGINS. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/12/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Vujasinovic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall O Sorrels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Bar Association
Represented By: Amanda Marie Kates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Amuny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D Crain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidel Rodriquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy-Adele Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen J Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amie S Peace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Parker
Represented By: Jason T Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: August W Harris, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry C Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Clower Keathley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Nicole Voyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E McKnight, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dimitri Dube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudolph K Metayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory W Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vuk Vujasinovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison W Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Pretorius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Thomas Vick, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan E Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley C Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estrella Escobar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shari Goldsberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa S Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dinesh H Singhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie W Dippel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe K Longley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baili B Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alistair B Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VB Attorneys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Horkey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc E Gravely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarrod T Foerster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen M Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelica Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Charles Ginn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dokupil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Oddo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldo D Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil D Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?