Solis v. US Bank National Association as Legal Trust Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust et al
Plaintiff: Edelmiro G Solis
Defendant: Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Trust Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust, US Bank National Association as Legal Trust Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust and Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01543
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Brantley Starr
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER GRANTING the parties' Joint Motion to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference by Remote or Electronic Means, Doc. #9 . (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 7/23/2020) (chmb)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference by Remote or Electronic Means filed by Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC, US Bank National Association as Legal Trust Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Sanders, Jason)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice of Option to Consent to Proceed Before the Magistrate Judge. If appropriate, party(ies) should return the signed consent form to the clerk. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 7/20/2020) (oyh)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR SCHEDULING PROPOSALS: The Joint Scheduling Proposal is due within 30 days of the date of this order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 7/20/2020) (oyh)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 Appendix in Support filed by Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC, US Bank National Association as Legal Trust Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust re #5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Sanders, Jason)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC, US Bank National Association as Legal Trust Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Mot4Judgment on Pleadings) (Sanders, Jason)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cea)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Trust Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust. (Sanders, Jason)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Trust Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust, Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10908983) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A Civil Cover Sheet & Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) B State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit(s) C Index of Docs Filed, #4 Exhibit(s) C-1 Petition, #5 Exhibit(s) C-2 Proposed TRO, #6 Exhibit(s) C-3 TRO, #7 Exhibit(s) C-4 Citations to US Bank Trustee & Rushmore, #8 Exhibit(s) C-5 Defs' Answer & Affirmative Defenses, #9 Exhibit(s) D Certificate of Interested Parties) (Sanders, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solis v. US Bank National Association as Legal Trust Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edelmiro G Solis
Represented By: Robert C Newark, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC
Represented By: Jason L Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Trust Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust
Represented By: Jason L Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association as Legal Trust Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust
Represented By: Jason L Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC
Represented By: Jason L Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?